WV HB5551 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to require certain licensees to obtain continuing education on domestic violence or abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to continuing education concerning domestic violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 403) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29SenateTo Government Organization
2024-02-29SenateTo Government Organization
2024-02-29SenateIntroduced in Senate
2024-02-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-02-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 403)
2024-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2024-02-28HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2024-02-28HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2024-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2024-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2024-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-26HouseRead 1st time
2024-02-26HouseImmediate consideration
2024-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-26HouseDo pass
2024-02-09HouseTo House Government Organization
2024-02-09HouseIntroduced in House
2024-02-09HouseTo Government Organization
2024-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3017aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=5551&year=2024&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb5551%20intr.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=5551
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb5551%20eng.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=5551
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb5551%20hfa%20phillips%202-28%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb5551%20hfa%20phillips%202-28%20_1%20adopted.htm
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=893335052
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=893335024
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/house/00403.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback