WV HB5514 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 117, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is enhance training requirements for county boards of education members by increasing the number of hours required for training, authorizing the State Board to require members to attend additional training when beneficial, modifying training topics, increasing the compensation rate for meeting attendance and decreasing the number of meetings members may be compensated to attend, prohibiting compensation to county board members who have not complied with all training requirements and including the chairs of the House and Senate Education Committees as ex officio members of the county board member standards training review committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhancing training requirements for county boards of education members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 689) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 417) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 388) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-22HouseChapter 117, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
2024-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal
2024-03-27HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/24
2024-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal
2024-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal
2024-03-21HouseTo Governor 3/21/2024
2024-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal
2024-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2024-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2024-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-03-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 689)
2024-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2024-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2024-03-07SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 417)
2024-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2024-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading
2024-03-06SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2024-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2024-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2024-03-05SenateRead 1st time
2024-03-05SenateImmediate consideration
2024-03-05SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2024-02-29SenateTo Education
2024-02-29SenateTo Education
2024-02-29SenateIntroduced in Senate
2024-02-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-02-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 388)
2024-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2024-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2024-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-26HouseRead 1st time
2024-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-23HouseBy substitute, do pass
2024-02-15HouseTo House Finance
2024-02-15HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2024-02-07HouseTo House Education
2024-02-07HouseIntroduced in House
2024-02-07HouseTo Education then Finance
2024-02-07HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1851aAmended CodeCitation Text
1854Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=5514&year=2024&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb5514%20intr.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=5514
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb5514%20sub.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=5514
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb5514%20sub%20enr.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=5514
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hb5514%20h%20ed%20am%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hb5514%20s%20ed%20am%20_1%203-4.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hb5514%20s%20ed%20am%20_1%203-4%20adopted.htm
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=893924805
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/house/00388.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0417.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/house/00689.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback