WV HB5358 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create an ombudsman program within the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to review complaints against a state agency or correctional facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating an ombudsman program within the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to review complaints against a state agency or correctional facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 380) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29SenateTo Judiciary
2024-02-29SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2024-02-29SenateIntroduced in Senate
2024-02-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-02-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 380)
2024-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2024-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2024-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-26HouseRead 1st time
2024-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-23HouseBy substitute, do pass
2024-02-16HouseTo House Judiciary
2024-02-16HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2024-01-30HouseTo House Jails and Prisons
2024-01-30HouseIntroduced in House
2024-01-30HouseTo Jails and Prisons then Judiciary
2024-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15A141New CodeSee Bill Text
15A142New CodeSee Bill Text
15A143New CodeSee Bill Text
15A144New CodeSee Bill Text
15A145New CodeSee Bill Text
15A146New CodeSee Bill Text
15A147New CodeSee Bill Text
15A148New CodeSee Bill Text
15A149New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback