WV HB5337 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to establish the legislative oversight committee of the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation; clarify that the legislative oversight committee shall be charged with the immediate and ongoing oversight of the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation's juvenile detention facilities and adult correctional facilities; and provide for executive sessions of the committee in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the legislative oversight committee of the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 208) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2024-02-27SenateReported do pass, but first to Judiciary
2024-02-20SenateTo Government Organization
2024-02-20SenateTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2024-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate
2024-02-16HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-02-16HousePassed House (Roll No. 208)
2024-02-16HouseRead 3rd time
2024-02-16HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-15HouseRead 2nd time
2024-02-15HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-14HouseRead 1st time
2024-02-14HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-13HouseDo pass
2024-01-29HouseTo House Judiciary
2024-01-29HouseIntroduced in House
2024-01-29HouseTo Judiciary
2024-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15A319New CodeSee Bill Text
312026New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback