WV HB5093 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-28 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to clean up language relating to the revision of order concerning distribution of marital property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to revision of orders concerning distribution of marital property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 297) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-28SenateTo Judiciary
2024-02-28SenateTo Judiciary
2024-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate
2024-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 297)
2024-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2024-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-23HouseRead 2nd time
2024-02-23HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-22HouseRead 1st time
2024-02-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2024-01-25HouseTo House Judiciary
2024-01-25HouseIntroduced in House
2024-01-25HouseTo Judiciary
2024-01-25HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
485706Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback