WV HB5050 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This purpose of this bill is to authorize legislative rules for the Higher Education Policy Commission regarding Guidelines for Employing and Evaluating Presidents, Higher Education Adult Part-Time Student (HEAPS) Grant Program, West Virginia Providing Real Opportunities for Maximizing In-State Student Excellence (PROMISE) Scholarship Program, Dual Enrollment Pilot Program, Science, Technology, Engineering, and Math Scholarship Program, Higher Education Grant Program, and Nursing Scholarship Program; to authorize legislative rules for the Council for Community and Technical College Education regarding Higher Education Accountability System, Dual Enrollment Pilot Program, Initial Authorization of Degree-Granting Institutions, and Tuition and Fees; and repealing the Council for Community and Technical College Education's rule regarding Accountability System.
Title
Relating to authorizing legislative rules regarding higher education.
Sponsors
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Christopher Toney [R] | Del. Jimmy Willis [R] | Del. Michael Hornby [R] |
Del. Wayne Clark [R] | Del. Patrick Lucas [R] | Del. Todd Longanacre [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-06 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/7/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-02 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-23 | House | To House Education |
2024-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-23 | House | To Education |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 17 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 17 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |