WV HB4978 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expiring funds to the balance of the Department of Transportation, State Rail Authority, West Virginia Commuter Rail Access Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expiring funds to the balance of the Department of Transportation, State Rail Authority, West Virginia Commuter Rail Access Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2020-03-04HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-03HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-02HouseDo pass
2020-03-02HouseOriginating in House Finance

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback