WV HB4976 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Making a supplementary appropriation to the School Building Authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making a supplementary appropriation to the School Building Authority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2020-03-04HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-03HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-02HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-02-28HouseTo House Finance
2020-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-28HouseTo Finance
2020-02-28HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB852 (Similar To) 2020-04-14 - Chapter 29, Acts, Regular Session, 2020

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback