WV HB4971 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a closing hospital
Title
Relating to a closing hospital
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 374) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 373) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 373) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 374) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 373) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-26 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Amendment pending |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-21 | House | Originating in House Government Organization |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 2D | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |