WV HB4958 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 227, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to eliminating the ability of a person’s driver license to be suspensed for failure to pay court fines and costs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to eliminating the ability of a person’s driver license to be suspended for failure to pay court fines and costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 769) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 768) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 518) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 518) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 371) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 370) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15HouseChapter 227, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseEffective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 769)
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 768)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-06SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-06SenateEffective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 518)
2020-03-06SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 518)
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenateAmended on 3rd reading (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenateReturned to calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateRemoved from calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-03SenateOn 1st reading
2020-03-02SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-26HouseEffective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 371)
2020-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 370)
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-25HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-25HouseAmendment rejected (Voice vote)
2020-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-24HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-24HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-21HouseDo pass
2020-02-21HouseOriginating in House Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17B33aAmended CodeCitation Text
17B33cAmended CodeCitation Text
5032aAmended CodeCitation Text
62417Amended CodeCitation Text
8102aAmended CodeCitation Text
8102bAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4958&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4958%20ORG.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4958
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4958%20ENG.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4958
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4958%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4958
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00370.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00371.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-06-0518.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00768.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00769.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback