WV HB4955 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 148, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 148, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reducing the cost of fees for state licenses to carry concealed deadly weapons and provisional state licenses to carry concealed deadly weapons
Title
Relating to reducing the cost of fees for state licenses to carry concealed deadly weapons and provisional state licenses to carry concealed deadly weapons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 413) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 210) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 193) (Y: 11 N: 80 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - Previous Question rejected (Roll No. 192) (Y: 35 N: 56 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 210) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 193) (Y: 11 N: 80 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - Previous Question rejected (Roll No. 192) (Y: 35 N: 56 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 148, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-24 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 413) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 210) |
2020-02-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 193) |
2020-02-14 | House | Previous Question rejected (Roll No. 192) |
2020-02-14 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2020-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-12 | House | Originating in House Finance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |