WV HB4933 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 167, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to exclude dentures from the $1,000 dental coverage cap.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Medicaid dental coverage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-01 - House - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 417) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 416) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 310) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 310) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 111) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 110) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-22HouseChapter 167, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
2024-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/24 - House Journal
2024-03-26HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/24
2024-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/2024 - Senate Journal
2024-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/13/2024 - Senate Journal
2024-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/13/2024 - House Journal
2024-03-13HouseTo Governor 3/13/2024
2024-03-04SenateHouse Message received
2024-03-01HouseCompleted legislative action
2024-03-01HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-03-01HouseEffective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 417)
2024-03-01HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 416)
2024-03-01HouseImmediate consideration
2024-03-01HouseHouse received Senate message
2024-02-28SenateSenate requests House to concur
2024-02-28SenateEffective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 310)
2024-02-28SenateTakubo title amendment adopted
2024-02-28SenateCommittee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2024-02-28SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 310)
2024-02-28SenateRead 3rd time
2024-02-28SenateOn 3rd reading
2024-02-27SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2024-02-27SenateRead 2nd time
2024-02-26SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/26/2024
2024-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2024-02-24SenateRead 1st time
2024-02-24SenateOn 1st reading
2024-02-23Senate2nd reference dispensed
2024-02-23SenateSenate reconsidered action (voice vote)
2024-02-23SenateReported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance
2024-02-09SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2024-02-09SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Finance
2024-02-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2024-02-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-02-07HouseEffective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 111)
2024-02-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 110)
2024-02-07HouseRead 3rd time
2024-02-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-06HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2024-02-06HouseRead 2nd time
2024-02-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-05HouseRead 1st time
2024-02-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2024-02-02HouseBy substitute, do pass
2024-01-31HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2024-01-31HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources
2024-01-19HouseTo House Banking and Insurance
2024-01-19HouseIntroduced in House
2024-01-19HouseTo Banking and Insurance then Health and Human Resources
2024-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9512aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4933&year=2024&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4933%20intr.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=4933
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4933%20sub.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=4933
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4933%20sub%20eng.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=4933
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4933%20sub%20enr.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=4933
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hb4933%20h%20b_i%20am%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4933%20hfa%20summers%202-5%20_2.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4933%20hfa%20summers%202-5%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4933%20hfa%20summers%202-5%20_2%20adopted%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4933%20hfa%20summers%202-5%20_2%20adopted%20adopted%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4933%20hfa%20summers%202-5%20_2%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hb4933%20s%20h_hr%20amt%20_%202-20.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hb4933%20s%20h_hr%20am%20_%202-20.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hb4933%20s%20h_hr%20am%20_%202-20%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4933%20sfat%20maroney%20_%202-27.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4933%20sfat%20maroney%20_%202-27%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/com_amends/hb4933%20s%20h_hr%20amt%20_%202-20%20withdrawn.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/house/00110.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/house/00111.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/senate/02-28-0310.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/house/00416.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/house/00417.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback