WV HB4840 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Office of Miners Health
Title
Relating to Office of Miners Health, Safety and Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - Motion to postpone indefinitely tabled (Roll No. 316) (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Motion to substitute minority report for Government Organization committee report rejected (Roll No. 244) (Y: 25 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-02-25 - House - Motion to substitute minority report for Government Organization committee report rejected (Roll No. 244) (Y: 25 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, House Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendments pending |
2022-03-01 | House | Motion to postpone indefinitely tabled (Roll No. 316) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-25 | House | Motion to substitute minority report for Government Organization committee report rejected (Roll No. 244) |
2022-02-25 | House | Originating in House Government Organization |