WV HB4827 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the promotion and development of public-use vertiports
Title
Relating to the promotion and development of public-use vertiports
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Clay Riley [R] | Del. Bryan Ward [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 694) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 693) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 530) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 530) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 275) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 274) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 693) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 530) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 530) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 275) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 274) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 694) |
2022-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 693) |
2022-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 530) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 530) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary on 2nd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2022-03-01 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2022-03-01 | Senate | To Economic Development then Judiciary |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 275) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 274) |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-02-18 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2022-02-18 | House | Originating in House Select Committee on Tourism and Economic Diversification |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 2K | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |