WV HB4826 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to e-sports
Title
Relating to e-sports
Sponsors
Del. Moore Capito [R] | Sen. Bennett Queen [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Shawn Fluharty [D] |
Del. Clay Riley [R] | Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. William Nestor [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 661) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 466) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 346) (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 466) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 346) (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Became law without Governor's signature - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | House | Became law without Governor's signature- House Journal |
2022-03-30 | House | Became law 3/30/22 |
2022-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 661) |
2022-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 466) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 346) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-18 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-18 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-02-18 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |