WV HB4820 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - House rejected (Roll No. 289)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - House rejected (Roll No. 289)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to inventory of firearms owned by state agencies
Title
Relating to inventory of firearms owned by state agencies
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 289) (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | House rejected (Roll No. 289) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-11 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 3A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 6 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 6C | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15A | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 29G | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 16A | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 1 | 1f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 2C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 12 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 18 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22A | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31A | 8A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 2 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 20E | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16B | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 1 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 35a | New Code | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 18a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 2 | 9a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |