WV HB4797 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To create an EV Infrastructure Deployment Plan for West Virginia that describes how our state intends to use its share of NEVI Formula Program funds.
Title
To create an EV Infrastructure Deployment Plan for West Virginia that describes how our state intends to use its share of NEVI Formula Program funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 389) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 233) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 233) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 389) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-24 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2022-02-24 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 233) |
2022-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-15 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |