WV HB4761 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Resources to develop a submission procedures manual and adopt the same as a procedural rule.
Title
Authorizing the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Resources to develop a submission procedures manual and adopt the same as a procedural rule.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-15 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 4A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |