WV HB4734 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to mine subsidence insurance
Title
Relating to mine subsidence insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - Effective October 1, 2016 (Roll No. 553) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 552) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Effective October 1, 2016 (Roll No. 400) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 400) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 322) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 552) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Effective October 1, 2016 (Roll No. 400) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 400) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 322) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | Effective October 1, 2016 (Roll No. 553) |
2016-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 552) |
2016-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Effective October 1, 2016 (Roll No. 400) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 400) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 322) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-26 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 30 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 30 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |