WV HB4729 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 180, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 180, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring higher education institutions to use previous versions or editions of instructional materials
Title
Requiring higher education institutions to use previous versions or editions of instructional materials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 409) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 227) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 227) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 180, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 409) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-19 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-19 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 227) |
2020-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-14 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-06 | House | To House Education |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-06 | House | To Education |
2020-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 10 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |