WV HB4692 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To revise the West Virginia Tax Increment Financing Act
Title
To revise the West Virginia Tax Increment Financing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 306) (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 305) (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 305) (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-03-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 306) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 305) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-15 | House | To Finance |
2022-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 11B | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 11B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 11B | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 11B | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 11B | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |