WV HB4683 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to require parents or guardians to participate in programs for juveniles in an out-of-home placement provided there is not a court finding that said participation is not in the best interest of the juvenile.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring parents or guardians to participate in programs for juveniles in an out-of-home placement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 28) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-26SenateTo Judiciary
2024-01-26SenateTo Judiciary
2024-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate
2024-01-24HouseCommunicated to Senate
2024-01-24HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2024-01-24HousePassed House (Roll No. 28)
2024-01-24HouseRead 3rd time
2024-01-24HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2024-01-23HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2024-01-23HouseRead 2nd time
2024-01-23HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2024-01-22HouseRead 1st time
2024-01-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2024-01-19HousePostponed on 1st reading, Special Calendar, until 1/22/2024
2024-01-19HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2024-01-18HouseBy substitute, do pass
2024-01-12HouseTo House Judiciary
2024-01-12HouseIntroduced in House
2024-01-12HouseTo Judiciary
2024-01-12HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
494712Amended CodeCitation Text
494712aNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4683&year=2024&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4683%20intr.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=4683
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4683%20sub.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=4683
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4683%20eng.htm&yr=2024&sesstype=RS&i=4683
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4683%20hfa%20mcgeehan%201-23%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4683%20hfa%20mcgeehan%201-23%20_1%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4683%20hfa%20mcgeehan%201-23%20_1%20adopted%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4683%20hfat%20fast%201-24.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2024/RS/floor_amends/hb4683%20hfat%20fast%201-24%20adopted.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2024/RS/votes/house/00028.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback