WV HB4668 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to raise the allowable threshold of the coal severance tax revenue fund budgeted for personal services from one fourth to one half.
Title
Raising the allowable threshold of the coal severance tax revenue fund budgeted for personal services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 497) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 497) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 345) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 344) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 497) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 345) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 344) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 497) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 497) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-03-03 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-03-03 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 345) |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 344) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-24 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-02-22 | House | To House Energy |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-22 | House | To Energy then Finance |
2016-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |