WV HB4664 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying the offense of driving under the influence of alcohol, controlled substances, or drugs
Title
Clarifying the offense of driving under the influence of alcohol, controlled substances, or drugs
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. David Kelly [R] | Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] | Del. Rodney Miller [D] |
Del. Nathan Brown [D] | Sen. Bennett Queen [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 124) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 124) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 5 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |