WV HB4660 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the status of beds when an intermediate care facility for individuals with intellectual disabilities closes
Title
Establishing the status of beds when an intermediate care facility for individuals with intellectual disabilities closes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 271) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 270) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 270) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-03-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 271) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 270) |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-28 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-14 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 2D | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |