WV HB4659 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 194, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 194, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit local public health departments to bill for health care service fees without having to obtain the approval of the Commissioner of the Bureau for Public Health.
Title
Authorizing local health departments to bill health insurance plans for services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 614) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 494) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 313) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 494) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 313) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 194, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 614) |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 494) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 313) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-24 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-02-22 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-22 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2016-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 2 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |