WV HB4648 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The Parenting Fairness Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Parenting Fairness Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 780) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 561) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 530) (Y: 10 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 359) (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 334) (Y: 40 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 780)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-07SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 561)
2020-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-07SenateFloor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateAmendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 530)
2020-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-05SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-05SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 359)
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-25HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 334)
2020-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-24HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-24HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-02-06HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-02-03HouseTo House Senior, Children, and Family Issues
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-03HouseTo Senior, Children, and Family Issues then Judiciary
2020-02-03HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB5 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
481210Repealed CodeCitation Text
481239aNew CodeSee Bill Text
481239bNew CodeSee Bill Text
481239cNew CodeSee Bill Text
481239dNew CodeSee Bill Text
489102Amended CodeCitation Text
489203Amended CodeCitation Text
489204Amended CodeCitation Text
489204aNew CodeSee Bill Text
489206Amended CodeCitation Text
489207Amended CodeCitation Text
489209Amended CodeCitation Text
489401Amended CodeCitation Text
489403Amended CodeCitation Text
489601Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback