WV HB4639 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House rejected (Roll No. 358)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House rejected (Roll No. 358)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changing annual mandatory state inspections of motor vehicles to every three years
Title
Changing frequency of mandatory state inspections of motor vehicles
Sponsors
Del. Larry Kump [R] | Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. Jim Butler [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Del. Vernon Criss [R] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 358) (Y: 48 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 357) (Y: 48 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 357) (Y: 48 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | House rejected (Roll No. 358) |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 357) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-14 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-14 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-01-31 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-31 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Finance |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4016 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 10 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 16 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 16 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |