WV HB4633 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding county commissions' ability to dispose of county or district property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding county commissions' ability to dispose of county or district property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-17HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-17HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-14HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-14HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-13House2nd reference dispensed
2020-02-13HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-31HouseTo House Political Subdivisions
2020-01-31HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-31HouseTo Political Subdivisions then Government Organization
2020-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB64 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - To Government Organization

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
733Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback