WV HB4629 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 31, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 31, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to broadband enhancement and expansion policies generally
Title
Relating to broadband enhancement and expansion policies generally
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 524) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 524) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 555) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 554) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 453) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 453) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 265) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 264) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 524) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 555) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 554) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 453) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 453) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 265) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 264) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Chapter 31, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 524) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 524) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 555) |
2018-03-10 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 554) |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report received-House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | To conference |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House appointed conferees: Hanshaw, Zatezalo, Isner |
2018-03-10 | House | House agreed to conference |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Smith, Gaunch, Jeffries |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 453) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 453) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-03-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-03-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 265) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 264) |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-26 | House | Immediate consideration |
2018-02-26 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-26 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31G | 1 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
31G | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31G | 4 | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
31G | 4 | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
31G | 4 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |