WV HB4623 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Common Interest Ownership Act
Title
Uniform Common Interest Ownership Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36B | 1 | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
36B | 3 | 108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
36B | 3 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |