WV HB4623 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add two additional members to the Equal Pay Commission, one from the House of Delegates and one from the Senate. The bill would increase the number of members from seven to nine.
Title
Adding six additional members to the Equal Pay Commission, three from the House of Delegates and three from the Senate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 112, Acts, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/22/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/22/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-22 | To Governor 3/22/10 | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 100) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-13 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 99) | |
2010-03-13 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-13 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-13 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-13 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-13 | Reported do pass | |
2010-03-02 | To Government Organization | |
2010-03-02 | To Government Organization | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Passed House (Roll No. 130) | |
2010-03-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-01 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-26 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-25 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-24 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-02-22 | To House Government Organization | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-22 | To Government Organization | |
2010-02-22 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 5E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4623&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |