WV HB4595 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Create camera assisted enforcement of speeding in active work zones
Title
Create camera assisted enforcement of speeding in active work zones
Sponsors
Del. Josh Booth [R] | Del. Ken Reed [R] | Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Del. Clay Riley [R] |
Del. Austin Haynes [R] | Del. Mark Zatezalo [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] | Del. Joey Garcia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2022-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-09 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-09 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2022-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4790 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 6 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 6 | 7B | New Code | See Bill Text |