WV HB4594 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make a requirement that to be eligible for a license to engage in the practice of psychology, an applicant with a doctor of philosophy degree or its equivalent must have at least one thousand eight hundred hours from a doctoral internship.
Title
Relating to predoctoral psychology internship qualifications
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Isaac Sponaugle [D] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] | Del. William Hartman [D] |
Del. Jim Morgan [D] | Del. Saira Blair [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Jim Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 437) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 194) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 194) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 437) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2016-02-26 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-02-26 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 194) |
2016-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-19 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-02-19 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2016-02-17 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-17 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization |
2016-02-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 21 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |