WV HB4591 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to accelerating the conversion of the state excise tax on the privilege of transferring real property into a county excise tax
Title
Relating to accelerating the conversion of the state excise tax on the privilege of transferring real property into a county excise tax
Sponsors
Del. John Hardy [R] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. Austin Haynes [R] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] |
Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Don Forsht [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] |
Del. Caleb Hanna [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 204) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 204) |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-09 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-09 | House | To Finance |
2022-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 22 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |