WV HB4587 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 306, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 306, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modernizing the Public Service Commission's regulation of solid waste motor carriers and solid waste facilities
Title
Modernizing the Public Service Commission's regulation of solid waste motor carriers and solid waste facilities
Sponsors
Del. Dean Jeffries [R] | Del. Carl Martin [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] |
Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. Terrishie Sypolt [R] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 765) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 556) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 354) (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 556) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 354) (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 306, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 765) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Maynard Title amendment #2 adopted |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Maynard Title amendment #1 withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 556) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 354) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-29 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24A | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24A | 5 | 2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
24A | 5 | 2b | New Code | See Bill Text |