WV HB4585 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing immunity from civil or criminal liability for making good faith reports of suspected or known instances of child abuse or neglect
Title
Providing immunity from civil or criminal liability for making good faith reports of suspected or known instances of child abuse or neglect
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 555) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 122) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 122) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 555) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 122) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 2 | 810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |