WV HB4583 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying the definition of incapacity so that incarceration in the penal system or detention outside of the United States may not be inferred as resulting in a lack of capacity to execute a power of attorney
Title
Clarifying the definition of incapacity so that incarceration in the penal system or detention outside of the United States may not be inferred as resulting in a lack of capacity to execute a power of attorney
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 447) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 381) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 176) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 381) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 176) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 447) |
2022-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 381) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 176) |
2022-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39B | 1 | 106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |