WV HB4582 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring certain claims against agencies of the state to be moral obligations of the state
Title
Declaring certain claims against agencies of the state to be moral obligations of the state
Sponsors
Del. Vernon Criss [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. John Hardy [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] |
Del. David Pethtel [D] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. William Hartman [D] | Del. John Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-29 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 366) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 366) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 129) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 128) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 366) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 129) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 128) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/5/20 |
2020-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/5/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-05 | Senate | To Governor 3/5/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 366) |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 366) |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 129) |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 128) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-29 | House | To House Finance |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-29 | House | To Finance |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |