WV HB4550 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow the Board of Barbers and Cosmetologists to establish an apprenticeship program for cosmetologists.
Title
Providing the Board of Barbers and Cosmetologists the authority to establish an apprenticeship program for cosmetologists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 221) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 221) |
2018-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-13 | House | To Government Organization |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 27 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 11a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 27 | 8c | New Code | See Bill Text |