WV HB4543 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 202, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 202, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to insurance coverage for diabetics
Title
Relating to insurance coverage for diabetics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 635) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 635) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 778) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 777) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 506) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 237) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 635) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 778) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 777) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 506) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 237) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 202, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 635) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 635) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 778) |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 777) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 506) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2020-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Health and Human Resources |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first to Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2020-02-20 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2020-02-20 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 237) |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-24 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-24 | House | Do pass, but first to Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-24 | House | Originating in House Health and Human Resources |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15C | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 16 | 16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 53 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 16 | 7g | New Code | See Bill Text |