WV HB4542 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow persons with property within rural fire protection districts to opt out of fire protection coverage by a municipality for a specified property. There is financial responsibility for services actually rendered to such property.
Title
Allowing persons with property within rural fire protection districts to opt out of fire protection coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 297) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Motion |
2016-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 297) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-27 | House | Immediate consideration |
2016-02-27 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-20 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-16 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 13 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |