WV HB4539 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide an annual annuity adjustment of 1 percent for eligible deputy sheriff retirants and surviving spouses. The bill sets a minimum amount of employer contribution.
Title
Providing an annual annuity adjustment of 1 percent for eligible deputy sheriff retirants and surviving spouses
Sponsors
Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. William Anderson [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] |
Del. Edward Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 219) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/2/18 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 219) |
2018-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-14 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-14 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-13 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 14D | 11a | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 14D | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |