WV HB4537 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a study conducted by the Division of Natural Resources on the Upper Mud River Lake
Title
Permitting DNR to issue up to 100 permits for boats greater than 10 horsepower on Upper Mud River Lake
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 236) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2020-02-20 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2020-02-20 | Senate | To Natural Resources then Finance |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 236) |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-11 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2020-01-24 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-24 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization |
2020-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 7 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |