WV HB4537 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update definitions and exemptions and clarify hearing notice procedures with regard to the regulation of chronic pain clinics.
Title
Relating to the regulation of chronic pain clinics
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Stansbury [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Don Perdue [D] |
Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 573) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 432) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 341) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 432) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 341) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 573) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 432) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-03-03 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 341) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-19 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-02-15 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2016-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-15 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2016-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB569 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Senator Plymale requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5H | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5H | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5H | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24A | 7 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |