WV HB4524 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Approved by Governor 3/25/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Making the entire state "wet" or permitting the sale of alcoholic liquors for off-premises consumption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making the entire state "wet" or permitting the sale of alcoholic liquors for off-premises consumption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 638) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 776) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 464) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 345) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 333) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 638)
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 776)
2020-03-07HouseConference report received-House
2020-03-07HouseConference report filed - House
2020-03-07SenateConference report filed - Senate
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseTo conference
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse appointed conferees: Westfall, Capito, Hartman
2020-03-07HouseHouse agreed to conference
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateSenate appoints conference committee: Weld, Takubo, Hardesty
2020-03-07SenateSenate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-06HouseHouse refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice)
2020-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-05SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 464)
2020-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-04SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-04SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-03SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-03SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 345)
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-25HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No. 333)
2020-02-25HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-25HouseFrom House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar
2020-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2020-02-10HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-02-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-06HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-05HouseDo pass
2020-01-24HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-24HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-24HouseTo Judiciary
2020-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6051Amended CodeCitation Text
6052Amended CodeCitation Text
6053Amended CodeCitation Text
6054Amended CodeCitation Text
6055Amended CodeCitation Text
6056Amended CodeCitation Text
6058Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4524&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4524%20INTR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4524
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4524%20ENG.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4524
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4524%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4524
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00333.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00345.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-05-0464.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00776.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0638.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback