WV HB4524 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide uniformity in the definitions of all-terrain vehicles and to include a definition for recreational off-highway vehicles.
Title
Revising the definition of "all-terrain vehicle" and including a definition for utility terrain vehicle
Sponsors
Del. Steven Kominar [D] | Del. Dale Martin [D] | Del. Jim Morgan [D] | Del. Douglas Reynolds [D] |
Del. David Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 6, Acts, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/25/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-25 | Approved by Governor 3/25/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/25/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/22/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/22/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-22 | To Governor 3/22/10 | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 23) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment to Senate amendment | |
2010-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-12 | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 297) | |
2010-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-10 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-10 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) | |
2010-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-10 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 36) | |
2010-03-10 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-09 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2010-02-26 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-02-26 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-02-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 89) | |
2010-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-25 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-24 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-24 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-23 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-02-22 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-02-17 | To House Roads and Transportation | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-17 | To Roads and Transportation then Government Organization | |
2010-02-17 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2 (Similar To) 2010-01-13 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
SB524 (Same As) 2010-03-13 - Senator Unger requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
SB524 (Same As) 2010-03-13 - Senator Unger requests to be removed as sponsor of bill
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17F | 1 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4524&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |