WV HB4519 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a summer youth intern pilot program within Department of Commerce

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a summer youth intern pilot program within Department of Commerce

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-17HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-17HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-14HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-14HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-13HouseDo pass
2020-02-06HouseTo House Education
2020-02-06HouseDo pass, but first to Education
2020-01-23HouseTo House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-23HouseTo Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Education
2020-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1827eNew CodeSee Bill Text
5B2D8New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback