WV HB4490 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to extend the expiration date of the freeze of the per diem rate to July 1, 2024.
Title
Extending the expiration date of the freeze of the per diem cost for incarcerated inmates in regional jails
Sponsors
Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. John Mandt [R] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Jonathan Pinson [R] | Del. David Kelly [R] | Del. John Paul Hott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-02-01 | House | To House Select Committee on Jails and Prisons |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-01 | House | To Select Committee on Jails and Prisons then Finance |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB557 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 3 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |