WV HB4490 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]


The purpose of this bill is to clarify the royalty owed to a royalty owner in an oil and gas lease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to oil and gas permits not to be on flat well royalty leases


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 255) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-01SenateTo Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateTo Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-03-01SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 255)
2018-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-26HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-23HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-02-19HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-02-19HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2018-02-12HouseTo House Energy
2018-02-12HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-12HouseTo Energy then Judiciary
2018-02-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB360 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Approved by Governor 3/9/18


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2268Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments